OR SB330 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes income tax credit for amount of unpaid rent forgiven by landlord and certified by Housing and Community Services Department. Establishes income tax credit for forgiveness by landlord of tenant's nonpayment of rent or other charges] amount of unpaid rent forgiven by landlord and certified by Housing and Community Services Department. Subtracts from federal taxable income tenant's discharge of indebtedness income attributable to landlord's forgiveness of nonpayment] unpaid rent. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a tax credit for the forgiveness of tenant debt; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-04-06SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-03-02SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Housing and Development, then Tax Expenditures.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback