OR SB33 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes State Department of Agriculture to establish additional food safety program license fees for fiscal years beginning July 1, 2022, and July 1, 2023. Authorizes State Department of Agriculture to establish additional food safety program license fees for fiscal years beginning July 1, 2022, and July 1, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to food safety program fees; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, July 19, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 564, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Pham. Passed. Ayes, 34; Nays, 22--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Evans, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Williams, Wright; Excused, 1--Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Speaker Kotek, Zika. |
2021-06-23 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 12--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Johnson, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery, then Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |