OR SB33 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Chapter 278, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Chapter 278, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
In computation by Department of Revenue of interest due on tax deficiency owed to department or refunds of tax owed by department, replaces rate based on month or partial month with annual percentage rate computed daily. Standardizes department procedures by delaying running of interest on overpayments of certain taxes. Applies to tax deficiencies or refunds owing as of January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax interest rate computations; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | Senate | Chapter 278, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Effective date, October 6, 2017. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Boone, Kennemer, Smith G. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 10, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 9, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-02 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-25 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2017-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Johnson, Steiner Hayward. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Carried over to 02-21 by unanimous consent. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |