OR SB328 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prescribes requirements for annual school district and school performance reports, including requirement for inclusion of data related to suspensions and expulsions. Prescribes requirements for annual school district and school performance reports, including requirement for inclusion of data related to suspensions and expulsions.
Title
Relating to annual reports related to schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |