OR SB323 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Justice to study automatic waiver to adult court of juveniles for crimes related to use of motor vehicles, and to provide results of study to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2024. Directs Department of Justice to study automatic waiver to adult court of juveniles for crimes related to use of motor vehicles, and to provide results of study to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2024. Sunsets January 2, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the waiver of juveniles for crimes related to motor vehicles.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-01-12SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback