OR SB319 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Effective date, March 20, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Effective date, March 20, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes local governments to allow medical marijuana dispensaries and marijuana retailers licensed by Oregon Liquor Control Commission to be located within certain distance of schools. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to cannabis; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Senate | Effective date, March 20, 2017. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Chapter 007, 2017 Laws. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-03-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-03-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Hayden, Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 2--Evans, Smith G. |
2017-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 13, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-08 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to Marijuana Regulation. |
2017-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Thomsen granted unanimous consent to change vote from nay to aye. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Dembrow, Johnson. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Marijuana Regulation. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |