OR SB318 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates moneys to Department of Justice for purposes of funding analyst and investigator positions to address organized retail theft. Directs Department of Justice to study ways to address organized retail theft, and to provide results of study to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2023.] Sunsets January 2, 2024.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Appropriates moneys to Department of Justice for purposes of funding analyst and investigator positions to address organized retail theft.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to organized retail theft.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Committee (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-05-24SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
2023-03-28SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2023-03-28SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-03-21SenateWork Session held.
2023-03-08SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-12SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB318
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB318/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB318/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB318/A-Engrossed
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/22935
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23380
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76279
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76870
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66280
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76367
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76577
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264009
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263864
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265887
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266010
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34725

Bill Comments

feedback