OR SB318 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Public Utility Commission to determine resource adequacy for load serving entities. Requires Public Utility Commission to establish resource adequacy requirement applicable to all load serving entities. Requires load serving entity to submit resource adequacy plan to commission.] Authorizes Public Utility Commission to determine resource adequacy for load serving entities. If commission determines resource adequacy, directs commission to require load serving entities to periodically make certain demonstrations. Authorizes commission to direct public utility to acquire and procure physical resources and qualifying capacity] to meet resource adequacy requirement that electricity service supplier] load serving entity other than public utility is unable to meet in certain circumstances.
Title
Relating to resource adequacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |