OR SB316 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes rate of compensation to be paid by Oregon Liquor Control Commission to distillery retail outlet agent for distilled liquor retail sales by agent. Establishes rate of compensation to be paid by Oregon Liquor Control Commission to distillery retail outlet agent for distilled liquor retail sales by agent. Sunsets January 2, 2028.
Title
Relating to distillery retail outlet agents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 649, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Hayden, Sanchez; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2021-06-23 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-21 | House | Rules suspended. First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Johnson, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |