OR SB313 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Task Force on Equitable Access to Arts Education and specifies composition of task force membership. Directs Arts Program to study issues relating to outcomes of arts education.] Specifies duties of task force. Directs task force to submit report to Legislative Assembly no later than January 7, 2019. Sunsets task force on June 30, 2019. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to arts education; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-07SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2017-04-20SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2017-04-17SenateWork Session held.
2017-04-10SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Business and Transportation, then Ways and Means.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback