OR SB309 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies number of weeks notice to interested persons in decedent's estate must be published. Modifies number of weeks notice to interested persons in decedent's estate must be published.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to publication of notice to interested persons.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-06SenateEffective date, January 1, 2024.
2023-04-06SenateChapter 18, 2023 Laws.
2023-03-29SenateGovernor signed.
2023-03-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-03-27SenatePresident signed.
2023-03-23HouseThird reading. Carried by Wallan. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Nguyen H, Reschke; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Helm.
2023-03-22HouseRules suspended. Carried over to March 23, 2023 Calendar.
2023-03-21HouseSecond reading.
2023-03-20HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-03-09HouseWork Session held.
2023-03-02HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-16HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2023-02-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-02-09SenateVote explanation filed by Boquist.
2023-02-09SenateThird reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Boquist, Robinson; Excused, 2--Findley, Gorsek.
2023-02-07SenateCarried over to 02-09 by unanimous consent.
2023-02-02SenateCarried over to 02-07 by unanimous consent.
2023-01-31SenateSecond reading.
2023-01-31SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-01-25SenateWork Session held.
2023-01-18SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-12SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB309
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB309/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB309/Enrolled
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66986
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66272
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66903
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75953
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73467
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/259278
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/258516
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/259220
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263175
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263093
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34192
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=555384
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34499
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=566256

Bill Comments

feedback