OR SB308 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Parks and Recreation Department to convene advisory committee to assist department in researching and developing recommendations for changes to campsite administration and reservation process to improve access for service-disabled veterans. Directs State Parks and Recreation Department to develop pilot program to test changes to campsite reservation process to improve access for service-disabled veterans.] Directs State Parks and Recreation Department to convene advisory committee to assist department in developing pilot program] researching and developing recommendations for changes to campsite administration and reservation process to improve access for service-disabled veterans. Requires department to submit report on results of pilot program] advisory committee to Legislative Assembly by September 15, 2021. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to reservations for use of state parks; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness, then Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |