OR SB302 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Effective date, April 21, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removes provisions related to marijuana offenses from Uniform Controlled Substances Act. Moves crimes, penalties, defenses to crimes and procedural provisions in Uniform Controlled Substances Act that apply to marijuana offenses to Control and Regulation of Marijuana Act. Adjusts penalties for certain crimes. Creates crimes of arson incident to manufacture of cannabinoid extract in first and second degrees. Makes corresponding changes to statutes referencing controlled substances to clarify applicability to cannabis and cannabis-derived products. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to cannabis; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26SenateEffective date, April 21, 2017.
2017-04-26SenateChapter 021, 2017 Laws.
2017-04-21SenateGovernor signed.
2017-04-13HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-04-13SenatePresident signed.
2017-04-06HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Fahey.
2017-04-06HouseThird reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by Lininger. Passed.Ayes, 34; Nays, 21--Alonso Leon, Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Bynum, Esquivel, Evans, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, McLane, Meek, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith G, Sollman, Sprenger, Vial, Whisnant; Excused, 5--Boone, Gorsek, Hack, Hayden, Malstrom.
2017-04-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2017 Calendar.
2017-04-04HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2017 Calendar.
2017-04-03HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 4, 2017 Calendar.
2017-03-30HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 3, 2017 Calendar.
2017-03-29HouseRules suspended. Carried over to March 30, 2017 Calendar.
2017-03-28HouseRules suspended. Carried over to March 29, 2017 Calendar.
2017-03-27HouseRules suspended. Carried over to March 28, 2017 Calendar.
2017-03-21HouseRules suspended. Carried over to March 27, 2017 Calendar.
2017-03-20HouseSecond reading.
2017-03-17HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2017-03-15HouseReferred to Marijuana Regulation.
2017-03-15HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2017-03-14SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 21; nays, 8--Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
2017-03-13SenateSecond reading.
2017-03-10SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2017-03-07HouseWork Session held.
2017-02-14SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Marijuana Regulation.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback