OR SB301 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires State Department of Fish and Wildlife to consider elk overpopulation when implementing Oregon Landowner Damage Program. Removes sunset on program.
Title
Relating to landowner damage tags.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 324, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barreto. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 4--Meek, Mitchell, Salinas, Sanchez; Absent, 1--Nosse; Excused, 3--Barker, Boles, Clem. |
2019-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-29 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-28 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-21 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2019-04-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Knopp, Steiner Hayward, Winters. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |