OR SB300 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes State Board of Towing within Department of Transportation. Establishes State Board of Towing within Department of Transportation. Authorizes board to order department to deny, suspend, revoke or refuse to renew towing business certificate or letter of appointment to participate on rotational list of towing businesses for certain violations. Authorizes board to impose civil penalties for certain violations. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to towing; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, July 19, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 578, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2021-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Thatcher declared potential conflict of interest. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Girod, Heard, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-05 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |