OR SB300 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals exemption from universal service fund charge for radio communications services, radio paging services, commercial mobile radio services, personal communications services and cellular communications services.
Title
Relating to the universal service fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |