OR SB30 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Chapter 181, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Chapter 181, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
In making determination of whether corporate affiliates are members of unitary group , allows reference to any corporation that is owned or controlled directly or indirectly by same interests. In making determination of whether corporate affiliates are members of unitary group, allows reference to any corporation that is owned or controlled directly or indirectly by same interests. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to unitary business determinations of corporate affiliates; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Chapter 181, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Effective date, October 6, 2017. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-05-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-18 | House | Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Boone, Clem; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Heard. |
2017-05-16 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass, and be placed on Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-10 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2017-03-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--DeBoer, Frederick, Thatcher. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |