OR SB3 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health benefit plans to cover emergency medical services transports. Requires health benefit plans to cover emergency medical services transports.
Title
Relating to medical transports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 312, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Prusak. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 2--Nearman, Reschke; Excused, 6--Alonso Leon, Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Smith DB, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Drazan, Holvey, Rayfield, Sanchez, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-04-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by President Courtney. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Gelser, Girod, Thomsen. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |