OR SB299 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 520, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows employers to limit number of hours of sick time that employees may accrue per year. Excludes certain individuals from determination of number of employees of employer. Modifies rate of pay for accrued sick time for certain individuals. Applies to hours worked and sick time accrued or used on or after January 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to sick leave; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-04SenateChapter 520, 2017 Laws.
2017-07-04SenateEffective date, July 1, 2017.
2017-06-29SenateGovernor signed.
2017-06-26HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-06-23SenatePresident signed.
2017-06-22SenateOlsen, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye.
2017-06-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
2017-06-15HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2017-06-15HouseThird reading. Carried by Barreto. Passed.Ayes, 35; Nays, 24--Barreto, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 1--Bentz.
2017-06-14HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 15, 2017 Calendar.
2017-06-13HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2017 Calendar.
2017-06-12HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2017 Calendar.
2017-06-08HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2017 Calendar.
2017-06-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2017 Calendar.
2017-06-06HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2017 Calendar.
2017-06-05HouseSecond reading.
2017-06-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2017-05-31HouseWork Session held.
2017-05-24HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2017-04-26HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2017-04-25SenateThird reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
2017-04-24SenateSecond reading.
2017-04-21SenateSubsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
2017-04-21SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.)
2017-04-17SenateWork Session held.
2017-04-10SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Workforce, then Ways and Means.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB299
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB299/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB299/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB299/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB299/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB299/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB299/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/25297
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=403935
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/26244
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=416674
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=417879

Bill Comments

feedback