OR SB297 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that judicial marshal certified by Department of Public Safety Standards and Training qualifies as police officer under Public Employees Retirement System. Provides that judicial marshal certified by Department of Public Safety Standards and Training qualifies as police officer under Public Employees Retirement System. Provides that judicial marshal employed on effective date of Act is entitled to service in retirement system as police officer for all service performed as certified judicial marshal. Changes references to Security and Emergency Preparedness Office of the Judicial Department to Marshal's Office of the Judicial Department. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to judicial marshals; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | Senate | Effective date, September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 173, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lewis. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 3--Bonham, Nearman, Reschke. |
2021-05-20 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-19 | House | Carried over to May 20, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-18 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-03-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Heard. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 4--Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson, Wagner. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |