OR SB296 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective date, June 8, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Chief Justice of Supreme Court, during period of statewide emergency and upon finding of good cause, to extend or suspend time period or time requirement in rule or statute in specified court proceedings. Authorizes Chief Justice of Supreme Court, during period of statewide emergency and upon finding of good cause, to extend or suspend time period or time requirement in rule or statute in specified court proceedings. Authorizes Chief Justice to direct or permit electronic court appearances during period of statewide emergency. Authorizes presiding judge of circuit court, during period of statewide emergency, to extend custody and postpone trials upon finding of good cause, and within specified limits.] Authorizes date of appearance in criminal citation to be more than 30 days after citation issuance date during period of statewide emergency. Extends sunset, from December 31, 2021, to December 31, 2022, on provisions granting Chief Justice of Supreme Court and presiding judge of circuit court certain authority during emergency related to COVID-19, including authority to extend custody and postpone criminal trials upon finding of good cause and within specified limits. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to judicial authority during statewide emergencies; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15SenateEffective date, June 8, 2021.
2021-06-15SenateChapter 199, 2021 Laws.
2021-06-08SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-01HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-27SenatePresident signed.
2021-05-26HouseThird reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 23--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Evans, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Morgan, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wilde, Wright, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
2021-05-25HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-24HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-20HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-11HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-29HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-12HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-07HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-07SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard.
2021-04-07SenateThird reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 10--Anderson, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Johnson, Thatcher.
2021-04-05SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-03-16SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-23SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback