OR SB296 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective date, June 8, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective date, June 8, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Chief Justice of Supreme Court, during period of statewide emergency and upon finding of good cause, to extend or suspend time period or time requirement in rule or statute in specified court proceedings. Authorizes Chief Justice of Supreme Court, during period of statewide emergency and upon finding of good cause, to extend or suspend time period or time requirement in rule or statute in specified court proceedings. Authorizes Chief Justice to direct or permit electronic court appearances during period of statewide emergency. Authorizes presiding judge of circuit court, during period of statewide emergency, to extend custody and postpone trials upon finding of good cause, and within specified limits.] Authorizes date of appearance in criminal citation to be more than 30 days after citation issuance date during period of statewide emergency. Extends sunset, from December 31, 2021, to December 31, 2022, on provisions granting Chief Justice of Supreme Court and presiding judge of circuit court certain authority during emergency related to COVID-19, including authority to extend custody and postpone criminal trials upon finding of good cause and within specified limits. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to judicial authority during statewide emergencies; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | Effective date, June 8, 2021. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Chapter 199, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 23--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Evans, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Morgan, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wilde, Wright, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2021-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-20 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-04-07 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 10--Anderson, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Johnson, Thatcher. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |