OR SB291 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Referred to Housing.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires landlords to adopt certain written screening criteria made available to applicants before accepting application. Directs office of the Governor, in consultation with Racial Justice Council's Housing and Homelessness Committee, to study laws related to housing and to provide results to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022.] Sunsets January 2, 2023.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Requires landlords to adopt certain written screening criteria made available to applicants before accepting application. Limits criminal behavior landlord may consider in screening applicant. Requires landlord to conduct individualized assessment of applicant and specify any basis for denial.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to housing.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Housing.
2021-04-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-01SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Boquist.
2021-04-01SenateBurdick, Girod, Golden, Hansell, Kennemer, Thatcher, Wagner declared potential conflict of interest.
2021-04-01SenateThird reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 13--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen.
2021-03-31SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-03-11SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-02-11SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Housing and Development.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback