OR SB291 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows governing body of county, city or district to authorize persons to exercise authority regarding Emergency Conflagration Act. Prohibits refusal or limitation of response under Emergency Conflagration Act based on lack or scarcity of structures in vicinity of fire.
Title
Relating to the Emergency Conflagration Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources by order of the President. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |