OR SB29 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Transfers authority to manage State Capitol State Park from State Parks and Recreation Department to Oregon Department of Administrative Services. Transfers authority to manage State Capitol State Park from State Parks and Recreation Department to Oregon Department of Administrative Services. Appropriates moneys to Oregon Department of Administrative Services for this purpose. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the State Capitol State Park; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-26SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2021-03-26SenateRecommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means.
2021-03-23SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-02SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Housing and Development.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback