OR SB29 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers authority to manage State Capitol State Park from State Parks and Recreation Department to Oregon Department of Administrative Services. Transfers authority to manage State Capitol State Park from State Parks and Recreation Department to Oregon Department of Administrative Services. Appropriates moneys to Oregon Department of Administrative Services for this purpose. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the State Capitol State Park; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |