OR SB289 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on June 9 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits person convicted of bias crime committed while on state waters or publicly owned outdoor recreation land from entering area under jurisdiction of State Parks and Recreation Department. Directs office of Governor, in consultation with Racial Justice Council's Environmental Equity Committee, to study laws related to environment and provide results to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022.] Sunsets January 2, 2023.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Prohibits person convicted of bias crime committed while on state waters or publicly owned outdoor recreation land from entering area under jurisdiction of State Parks and Recreation Department. Directs State Marine Board to revoke certain privileges from person convicted of bias crime committed while on state waters or publicly owned outdoor recreation land. Adds bias crime conviction to circumstances in which court may order State Fish and Wildlife Commission to revoke licenses, tags and permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to environmental equity.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-14SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-09HouseThird reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 17--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Leif, Levy, Moore-Green, Morgan, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright; Excused, 2--Evans, Nearman.
2021-06-08HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-03HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-02HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-25HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-20HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-06HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-29HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-28SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Boquist.
2021-04-28SenateThird reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Boquist, Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Heard, Kennemer.
2021-04-22SenateTaken from 04-22 Calendar and placed on 04-28 Calendar on voice vote.
2021-04-21SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-19SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-04-08SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-06SenateWork Session cancelled.
2021-03-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-11SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Energy and Environment.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback