OR SB288 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers duties to maintain system for notification and interagency coordination of state resources in response to emergencies from Department of State Police to Oregon Department of Administrative Services. Transfers duties to maintain system for notification and interagency coordination of state resources in response to emergencies from Department of State Police to Oregon Department of Administrative Services. Directs Department of State Police] Oregon Department of Administrative Services to expand existing interagency coordination efforts for responding to emergencies to include community-based and faith-based organizations that provide emergency response services to specified communities. Directs city, county and tribal emergency management agencies to expand emergency management planning activities to enhance emergency and disaster response to specified communities.] Expands definition of "qualified emergency service volunteer" who qualifies for indemnification under Oregon Tort Claims Act and workers' compensation benefits. Requires registered emergency health care providers who provide out-of-state service to party state under Emergency Management Assistance Compact to be considered Oregon Health Authority officers or employees for liability purposes under compact. Expands membership of Oregon Homeland Security Council to include State Resilience Officer.] Expands duties of State Resilience Officer. Requires Office of Emergency Management to conduct outreach program to specified types of organizations to facilitate enhancement of volunteer capabilities to provide emergency services. Requires Housing and Community Services Department to establish grant program to provide funding to nonprofit health and community organization for planning, equipment and training on resiliency during and after disaster and hazard occurrences. Appropriates moneys to fund programs.] Establishes Unreinforced Masonry Seismic Safety Program in Oregon Business Development Department to issue grants for improving seismic safety, stability and resiliency of qualifying unreinforced masonry and unreinforced concrete buildings. Specifies limits and conditions for grants. Establishes fund for grant program. Authorizes issuance of lottery bonds during biennium ending June 30, 2023, to finance program. Requires department to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2023, regarding operation of grant program.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to improving resilience in responding to disasters; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Informational Meeting held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |