OR SB285 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Higher Education Coordinating Commission to provide matching funds for Northwest National Marine Renewable Energy Center at Oregon State University to receive federal funds for deepwater test facility for utility scale wave energy converters. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] |
Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |