OR SB282 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Education, in cooperation with Oregon Health Authority, to conduct study to determine and recommend appropriate health standards to govern student use of computers, mobile digital devices and other electronic media in classrooms. Requires department by rule to adopt guidelines for limiting student use of computers, mobile digital devices and other electronic media in classrooms in accordance with health and safety guidelines department develops, allowing parent to give or deny consent for parent's child to participate in curricula that involve extensive work with computers, mobile digital devices or electronic media and offering parent alternative curricula that involve less exposure to computers, mobile digital devices or electronic media. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to use of electronic devices in classrooms; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Rep. Carla Piluso [D] | Sen. Charles Riley [D] |
Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Andrea Salinas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB282 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB282/Introduced |