OR SB280 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective date, June 8, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective date, June 8, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to criminal records checks performed by Department of Human Services and Oregon Health Authority. Modifies provisions relating to criminal records checks performed by Department of Human Services and Oregon Health Authority. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to criminal records checks of individuals who provide care; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | Effective date, June 8, 2021. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Chapter 198, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Wright, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Smith Warner, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-20 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-03-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Heard. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 2--Heard, Johnson; Excused, 4--Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson, Wagner. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |