OR SB279 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Human Services, to extent practicable, to avoid scheduling meetings and appointments involving child in foster care during school day. Directs Department of Human Services, to extent practicable, to avoid scheduling meetings and appointments involving child in foster care during school day. Requires caseworker to ensure child's case file indicates number of school days missed during semester if child misses more than four school days due to visitations scheduled by department. Directs department to collect data and submit reports to Legislative Assembly regarding school days missed by children in foster care due to visitations scheduled by department. Sunsets reporting requirement on January 1, 2024. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to school attendance of children in foster care; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-07SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-02HouseThird reading. Carried by Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 3--Clem, Nearman, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Boshart Davis, Bynum, Drazan, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-28HouseCarried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-05-27HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-26HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-19HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-17HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-06HouseReferred to Human Services.
2021-04-29HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-28SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Heard, Kennemer.
2021-04-26SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-04-13SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-01SenateWork Session not held.
2021-02-23SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback