OR SB277 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-19 - Referred to Housing and Development.
Pending: Senate Housing and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Housing and Community Services Department to study issues related to housing and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022. Directs Housing and Community Services Department to study issues related to housing and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022. Sunsets December 31, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to housing.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Housing and Development.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback