OR SB276 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: Senate Housing and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Housing and Community Services Department to provide grants to eligible entities for providing financial assistance to persons in low income households for repair and rehabilitation of residences. Authorizes Housing and Community Services Department to provide grants to eligible entities for providing financial assistance to persons in low income households for repair and rehabilitation of residences. Requires community action agencies that receive moneys from department to provide loans, grants or other financial assistance to income-eligible households to report to department no later than August 15, 2022. Requires department to report on grants to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to department for grants and distribution of moneys to community action agencies. Sunsets on January 2, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to supporting homeownership for low income individuals; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Housing and Development.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback