OR SB276 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Secretary of State to conduct annual financial review of moneys collected, borrowed, received and expended by Travel Information Council.
Title
Relating to the Travel Information Council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2014. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Chapter 523, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 30. |
2013-06-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Cameron. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley. |
2013-06-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 4, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-30 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2013-03-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Hass declared potential conflict of interest. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Rosenbaum. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Carried over to 03-07 by unanimous consent. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |