OR SB274 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands eligibility for support service brokerage services to individuals who are 14 to 17 years of age.
Title
Relating to age for individuals to qualify for developmental disability program support services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-06-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 1--Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Johnson, Steiner Hayward. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |