OR SB27 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Chapter 473, 2021 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Chapter 473, 2021 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that cover sheet of state, county, district and city initiatives list city and state of residence for chief petitioners, rather than residence address of chief petitioners. Requires that cover sheet of state, county, district and city initiatives list city and state of residence for chief petitioners, rather than residence address of chief petitioners. Requires notice of election for members of district board to be delivered to newspaper for printing, rather than be printed, no later than 40 days before filing deadline. Allows elections officer to post notice on county website in lieu of printing notice in newspaper. Clarifies requirements regarding notice of ballot measure election and ballot title for district ballot measures. Clarifies that certificate of nomination by individual electors must contain number of signatures of electors cast in relevant electoral district at last presidential election. Establishes signature requirement for certificate of nomination made by individual electors following change in boundaries of electoral district. Removes vector control districts from definition of district for purposes of special district elections. Alters procedures for hearing on whether to impose civil penalty for failing to properly file campaign finance statements. Clarifies that certain campaign finance statements may be filed electronically. Revises statutes to make clear that county clerk or other filing officer is not required to provide secrecy envelope for ballot if Secretary of State has approved alternative procedure to ensure secrecy. Authorizes county clerk to begin tallying any ballot received upon receipt of ballot. Requires each sheet of recall petition to include city and state of residence of chief petitioner, rather than address of chief petitioner. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to elections; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | Senate | Chapter 473, 2021 Laws. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Effective date, July 14, 2021. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 16; Nays, 12--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 1--Kennemer; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 6--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Hayden, Levy, Owens, Wallan; Excused, 1--Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 24, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-22 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 23, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-22 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-05-10 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 10--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Kennemer, Knopp, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 4--Burdick, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |