OR SB265 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission to conduct study to determine how best to fund public post-secondary education in Oregon. Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission to conduct study to determine how best to fund public post-secondary education in Oregon. Directs commission to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to education not later than September 15, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to higher education funding.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-01-11SenateReferred to Education.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback