OR SB262 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset for property tax exemption for multiple-unit housing. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the sunset of the property tax exemption for multiple-unit housing; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Sen. James Manning [D] | Sen. Chuck Thomsen [R] |
Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Finance and Revenue by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Finance and Revenue by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 322, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barker, Boles, Clem. |
2019-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-29 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-04-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--Heard, Johnson, Linthicum, Olsen. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Housing, then Finance and Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |