OR SB260 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Ocean Science Trust, State Department of Fish and Wildlife and Higher Education Coordinating Commission in certain amounts for certain purposes related to ocean chemistry. Requires State Department of Fish and Wildlife to establish program for strategic investments in initiatives related to ocean acidification and hypoxia.] Appropriates moneys from General Fund to department for purposes of program.] Oregon Ocean Science Trust, State Department of Fish and Wildlife and Higher Education Coordinating Commission in certain amounts for certain purposes related to ocean chemistry. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to ocean chemistry; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |