OR SB26 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective date, June 13, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective date, June 13, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Director of the Oregon Health Authority or director's designee to discharge employee at facility under jurisdiction of authority if it has been substantiated that employee physically or sexually abused patient or client. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to employees at facilities under the jurisdiction of the Oregon Health Authority; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Senate | Effective date, June 13, 2019. |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Chapter 357, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hernandez, Speaker Kotek. |
2019-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-21 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Thomsen. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |