OR SB259 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Maritime Sector Workforce Development. Directs task force to, consistent with work of predecessor task force, study and develop description of maritime sector and maritime sector workforce in Oregon and develop recommendations for State Workforce and Talent Development Board to incorporate consideration of maritime sector into statewide workforce development system plan. Requires task force to report to certain committees of Legislative Assembly and to State Workforce and Talent Development Board no later than September 15, 2020. Sunsets task force on December 31, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to maritime sector workforce development; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] |
Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Rescinding of the subsequent referral denied by Order of the President. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |