OR SB257 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Higher Education Coordinating Commission for agricultural experiment station and branch stations, Oregon State University Extension Service and Forest Research Laboratory programs of Oregon State University.
Title
Relating to state financial administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |