OR SB254 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expands potential recipients of levee project grants to include any public body. Includes flood control embankments and flood control facilities as subjects of levee projects. Specifies certain financial conditions for levee project grants. Includes construction or capital improvement projects in definition of "levee project."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the levee project subaccount.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-03-06SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2019-03-06SenateRecommendation: Do Pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-02-28SenateWork Session held.
2019-02-19SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback