OR SB254 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires financial institutions to participate in data match system established by Department of Revenue to identify assets held at financial institutions by delinquent debtors. Creates crime of misuse by state employee of information shared pursuant to data match system. Punishes by maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both. Authorizes Division of Child Support of Department of Justice to enter agreements to share information relating to hiring of individuals in this state with other divisions of department or with Department of Revenue. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to collection of debts owed to state; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] |
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-10 | Senate | Effective date, October 6, 2017. |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Chapter 644, 2017 Laws. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 54; Excused, 1--Johnson; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Fahey, Marsh, Nearman, Smith G, Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-27 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-06-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-06-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Carried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Accountability. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |