OR SB254 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Effective date, June 16, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increases fee on motor vehicle fuel metering instrument or device in accordance with graduated schedule. Becomes operative January 1, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to annual fees for motor vehicle fuel metering devices; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Finance and Revenue by prior reference (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-24SenateEffective date, June 16, 2015.
2015-06-24SenateChapter 448, 2015 Laws.
2015-06-16SenateGovernor signed.
2015-06-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-06-08SenatePresident signed.
2015-06-04HouseThird reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 47; Nays, 4--Evans, Hayden, Post, Weidner; Excused, 4--Buehler, Gorsek, Hack, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Bentz, Davis, McKeown, Vega Pederson, Speaker Kotek.
2015-06-03HouseSecond reading.
2015-06-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-06-01HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-05-19HouseReferred to Revenue by prior reference.
2015-05-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
2015-05-13HouseWork Session held.
2015-04-29HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-03-13HouseReferred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Revenue.
2015-03-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2015-03-05SenateJohnson, granted unanimous consent to declare potential conflict of interest after the vote.
2015-03-05SenateThird reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen.
2015-03-04SenateSecond reading.
2015-03-04SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-03-03SenateWork Session held.
2015-02-24SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-02-17SenateRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference.
2015-02-11SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-01-20SenateReferred to Business and Transportation, then Finance and Revenue.
2015-01-12SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback