OR SB251 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Effective date, October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Effective date, October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Decreases amount of lottery prize payment above which Oregon State Lottery Commission must withhold personal income tax for payment to Department of Revenue. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax withholding of lottery prize payment; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Effective date, October 6, 2017. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Chapter 019, 2017 Laws. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-04-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed.Ayes, 44; Nays, 14--Barreto, Clem, Evans, Gorsek, Hayden, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Post, Rayfield, Reschke, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 2--Boone, Piluso. |
2017-04-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 4, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-29 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed.Ayes, 20; nays, 9--Beyer, Ferrioli, Girod, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |