OR SB250 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits individual from being excluded from participation in or denied benefits under health benefit plan issued or delivered in this state based on actual or perceived race, color, national origin, sex, sexual orientation, gender identity, age or disability. Adopts Fry Graph Readability Formula for health insurance policies and materials approved by Department of Consumer and Business Services. Repeals mandatory terms for certain policy provisions and requires department to prescribe or approve terms.] Allows Oregon residents to be insured under master group policies issued outside of Oregon. Authorizes Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services to assess fee on insurer that is exempt from covering benefit required under ORS chapter 743A or other Insurance Code provision to prevent insurer from gaining market advantage due to exemption. Applies requirements for mental health parity to individual health benefit plans, other than grandfathered health plans. Exempts, from requirements applicable to health benefit plans issued to small employers, individual health benefit plans for which employee of small employer pays premiums from funds in health reimbursement arrangement established by employer. Requires individual health benefit plans to be offered on guaranteed issue basis without preexisting condition exclusions. Specifies exception. Allows Department of Consumer and Business Services to certify more than one bronze plan and silver plan.
Title
Relating to health insurance.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 285, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-29 | House | Third reading. Carried by Mitchell. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 8--Barreto, Findley, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Stark; Excused, 1--Greenlick. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-14 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-04-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 5--Boquist, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Carried over to 04-18 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |