OR SB246 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definition of "radioactive waste" for purposes of regulation by State Department of Energy. Modifies definition of "radioactive waste" for purposes of regulation by State Department of Energy. Requires Energy Facility Siting Council to adopt standards and rules necessary to prevent disposal of radioactive waste in Oregon. Provides Director of State Department of Energy and council additional authority for administration and enforcement of laws related to disposal of radioactive waste.
Title
Relating to radioactive material.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 38, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Wallan; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Levy, Lively, Nearman. |
2021-05-10 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-03-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Boquist, Heard, Johnson. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |