OR SB244 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits interest rate to no more than prime rate plus one percent for loans advanced under veterans' home and farm loan program. Limits interest rate to no more than prime rate plus one percent for loans advanced under veterans' home and farm loan program. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Veterans' Affairs for deposit in Oregon War Veterans' Fund, for biennium beginning July 1, 2023, to be used to advance loans to qualified veterans for acquisition of farms and homes.
Title
Relating to veterans' loans for acquisition of real property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Veterans, Emergency Management, Federal and World Affairs. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |